NM SB151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Car Title & Registration E-signatures
Title
Car Title & Registration E-signatures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2020-02-13 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-11 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCORC/SJC |