NM SB144 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - [LD 50] Passed House (61-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - [LD 50] Passed House (61-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Airborne hazards & open burn pit registry act
Title
Airborne hazards & open burn pit registry act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (61-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 94. |
2015-03-25 | House | [LD 47] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HGEIC |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HHC |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HHC and then to HGEIC |
2015-02-19 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |