NM SB136 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fix outdated child abuse nmsa reference
Title
Fix outdated child abuse nmsa reference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 10. |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |