NM SB134 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Mar.31) Ch. 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit synthetic cannabinoids

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit synthetic cannabinoids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-05 [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Mar.31) Ch. 16.
2011-02-23 [LD 37] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC
2011-02-13 [LD 27] PASSED/S (31-5)
2011-02-12 [LD 26] w/drn
2011-02-11 [LD 25] fl/a- w/drn scalendar- ref SFC-SFC
2011-02-07 [LD 21] DP/a
2011-01-22 [LD 5] w/o rec/a-SJC
2011-01-18 [LD 1] SPAC/SJC-SPAC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback