NM SB131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (66-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (66-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic ticket payment & reporting
Title
Traffic ticket payment & reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (66-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |