NM SB130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Credit For Transfer Students
Title
School Credit For Transfer Students
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-15 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SPAC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |