NM SB115 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safe Schools For All Students Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Schools For All Students Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-29House[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Referred to House Education
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary
2017-02-03Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (32-10)
2017-02-02Senate[LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-30Senate[LD 14] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-01-30Senate[LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-18Senate[LD 2] Referred to Senate Education
2017-01-18Senate[LD 2] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback