NM SB105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expedited Professional Licensure
Title
Expedited Professional Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 19 |
2016-02-05 | House | [LD 18] Passed House (65-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |