NM SB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require responses to medical board subpoenas
Title
Require responses to medical board subpoenas
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.121. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] HBIC/HJC-HBIC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP/a-SJC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |