NM SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 206 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Education Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Education Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 206 - Apr. 3
2019-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:19
2019-03-13HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-06HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2019-03-05SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-03-01SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-28SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-16SenateSent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback