NM HM92 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal child care program task force
Title
Federal child care program task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-20 | Senate | [LD 44] |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (44-0) SGND |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] HHC |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] HHC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |