NM HM91 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - [LD 31] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - [LD 31] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"asian american day"
Title
"asian american day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | [LD 31] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-03 | Senate | [LD 31] |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Passed House (70-0) |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Not Printed |