NM HM63 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"create hope for a cancer-free world day"
Title
"create hope for a cancer-free world day"
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Wooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (70-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Not Printed |