NM HM51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Northwestern nm snowstorm emergency
Title
Northwestern nm snowstorm emergency
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Begaye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] SGND. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/H (63-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] HAFC |