NM HM46 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - [LD 35] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - [LD 35] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create domestic animal abuse database
Title
Create domestic animal abuse database
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | [LD 35] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Passed House (43-0) |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |