NM HM4 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lesc Middle School Study
Title
Lesc Middle School Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2024-01-30 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-18 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2024-01-16 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |