NM HM4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Centennial Of League Of Women Voters
Title
Centennial Of League Of Women Voters
Sponsors
Rep. Joanne Ferrary [D] | Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] | Rep. Sheryl Stapleton [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Thomson [D] | Rep. Christine Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-01-22 | House | Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |