NM HM4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - [LD 7] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - [LD 7] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"better speech & hearing month"
Title
"better speech & hearing month"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | Senate | [LD 7] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-01-28 | Senate | [LD 7] |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (70-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |