NM HM35 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Possession Of Mount Cristo Rey Property
Title
Study Possession Of Mount Cristo Rey Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Passed House (65-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources |