NM HJR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow For Runoff Elections, Ca
Title
Allow For Runoff Elections, Ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:24 |
2019-02-28 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-12 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |