NM HJR14 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Los Lunas Land Transfer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Lunas Land Transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseSigned by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
2021-03-16SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2021-03-15SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-13SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
2021-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0
2021-03-13HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-12HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback