NM HJM9 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced practice nurse & midwife task force
Title
Advanced practice nurse & midwife task force
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (48-0) |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |