NM HJM60 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unm humanities research & teaching center
Title
Unm humanities research & teaching center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SRC | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP/a | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] HEC |