NM HJM46 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (25-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (25-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New mexico as disaster area
Title
New mexico as disaster area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (25-0) SGND. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] SCONC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] HTPWC |