NM HJM4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (33-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (33-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Battle of glorieta pass stamp
Title
Battle of glorieta pass stamp
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (33-0) Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |