NM HJM2 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical home model for managed care programs
Title
Medical home model for managed care programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP API. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SPAC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] PASSED/H (55-0) | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] DP | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HHGAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=2&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM002.pdf |