NM HJM1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bone Health Task Force
Title
Bone Health Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-02-06 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-21 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |