NM HB99 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (42-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (42-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adult fall risk & awareness program
Title
Adult fall risk & awareness program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (42-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 37. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (61-1) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |