NM HB97 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal Life Insurance Benefits Trust

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Life Insurance Benefits Trust

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-29House[LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 14
2017-02-12Senate[LD 27] Passed Senate (36-0)
2017-02-11Senate[LD 26] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2017-02-10Senate[LD 25] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-02-10Senate[LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-02-03Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2017-02-03Senate[LD 18] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance
2017-01-24House[LD 8] Passed House (65-0)
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-20House[LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary
2017-01-20House[LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Referred to House Business & Industry
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary
2017-01-17House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback