NM HB97 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove Some School Readiness Tests
Title
Remove Some School Readiness Tests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (61-0) |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |