NM HB92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vocational Rehabilitation Act
Title
Vocational Rehabilitation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Candy Ezzell [R] | Rep. Bob Wooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |