NM HB92 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery scholarships for tribal colleges
Title
Lottery scholarships for tribal colleges
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Begaye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SRC API. | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SIAC/SRC/SFC-SIAC | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] DP-HAFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HEC/HAFC-HEC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=92&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0092.pdf |