NM HB9 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 3) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 3) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require newborn infant heart disease testing
Title
Require newborn infant heart disease testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 3) Ch. 7. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (63-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to HHGIC |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |