NM HB82 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - [LD 9] SCORC/SFC-SCORC API.
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - [LD 9] SCORC/SFC-SCORC API.
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Develop tax expenditure budget
Title
Develop tax expenditure budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SCORC/SFC-SCORC API. | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP/a | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP/a-HAFC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] w/drn - ref HTRC/HAFC-HTRC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=82&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/bills/house/HB0082.pdf |