NM HB8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Land Grant-merced Assistance Fund
Title
Land Grant-merced Assistance Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] | Rep. Susan Herrera [D] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Rep. Matthew McQueen [D] |
Rep. Roger Montoya [D] | Rep. Kristina Ortez [D] | Rep. Andrea Romero [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Stefanics [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:6 |
2022-02-13 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Sent to SIRC - Referrals: SIRC/SFC |
2022-02-04 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:7 |
2022-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2022-01-31 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-25 | House | HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-19 | House | Sent to HRDLC - Referrals: HRDLC/HTRC |