NM HB79 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Thanksgiving Saturday Gross Receipts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Thanksgiving Saturday Gross Receipts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15House[LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 46
2018-02-15House[LD 10] h and then to cncrd
2018-02-15Senate[LD 20] Passed Senate (21-20)
2018-02-15Senate[LD 20] Floor amendment adopted
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Passed House (43-20)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-22House[LD 2] HLEDC
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Assigned to HLEDC and then to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Printed
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Not Printed
2018-01-16House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback