NM HB77 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms transfer act
Title
Firearms transfer act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Passed House (43-26) |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |