NM HB76 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care contracts no compete limits
Title
Health care contracts no compete limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-2) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |