NM HB70 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Passed Senate (29-9) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Passed Senate (29-9) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hearing Aid Option Information
Title
Hearing Aid Option Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (29-9) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (58-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Health |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Health and then to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |