NM HB70 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nmfa public project revolving fund projects
Title
Nmfa public project revolving fund projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 21. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Passed House (64-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Appropriations & Finance |