NM HB68 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 88 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Space Flight Informed Consent Act Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Space Flight Informed Consent Act Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-14HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 88 - Apr. 6
2021-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2021-03-13SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-08SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-19SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
2021-02-19HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2021-02-11HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-04HouseHTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-19HouseSent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HJC
2021-01-19HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback