NM HB67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 45 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 45 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tech Readiness Gross Receipts Tax Credit
Title
Tech Readiness Gross Receipts Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 45 - Mar. 8 |
2022-02-16 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2022-02-01 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-27 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-19 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HTRC |
2022-01-18 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |