NM HB66 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State funds in community banks
Title
State funds in community banks
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP API. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SFC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] SCORC/SFC-SCORC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP - PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DNP-CS/DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] w/drn - ref HBIC/HAFC-HBIC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC |