NM HB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater System Financing
Title
Wastewater System Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | House | [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 100 |
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (67-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HLELC |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HLELC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |