NM HB63 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hiv testing for certain crimes
Title
Hiv testing for certain crimes
Sponsors
Rep. John Heaton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.26. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SPAC/SJC-SPAC- DP-SJC | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] w/drn - ref HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC |