NM HB6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 270 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 270 - Apr. 4
2019-03-16HouseSenate Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseHouse Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseSent to CC
2019-03-15HouseSenate failed to recede from its amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse has failed to concur in Senate Amendments on a House Bill
2019-03-15SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:32 N:8
2019-03-15SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-14SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-02SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2019-03-01HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:25
2019-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-02-27HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-17HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback