NM HB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No compelled medication use for students
Title
No compelled medication use for students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 51. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (67-1) |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] HSCAC |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC and then to HSCAC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |