NM HB52 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
School administration of emergency medication
Title
School administration of emergency medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (66-1) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Education |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Education |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to HHGIC and then to House Education and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |