NM HB486 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metro court judge qualification
Title
Metro court judge qualification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SJC API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP/a | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP-HJC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=486&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0486.pdf |