NM HB470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appearances For Electronic Notary Acts
Title
Appearances For Electronic Notary Acts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Tabled Indefinitely, Bill Has Died |
2019-03-06 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-20 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-04 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=470&year=19 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/19%20Regular/bills/house/HB0470.pdf |